EP0158816 - Rotary sheet-printing machine for perfecting or multi-colour printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 29 40 69019 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 Postfach 10 29 40 D-69019 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirz, Arno Hindemithweg 15 D-6901 Bammental / DE | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102708.6 | 09.03.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | DE19843413159 | 07.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3413159 | [1985/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158816 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158816 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158816 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/06 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
B41F7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Bogen-Rotationsdruckmaschine zur Herstellung von einseitigem Mehrfarbendruck oder Schön- und Widerdruck | [1985/43] | English: | Rotary sheet-printing machine for perfecting or multi-colour printing | [1985/43] | French: | Rotative pour feuilles pour imprimer à retiration ou en plusieurs couleurs | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 09.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2639900 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG); | [Y]DE3201527 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DD]) |