EP0158821 - Apparatus and methods of extraterrestrial transportation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marwick, Edward F. 1121 E. Tapatio Drive Phoenix Arizona 85020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states Marwick, Edward F. 1121 E. Tapatio Drive Phoenix Arizona 85020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102760.7 | 11.03.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | US19840588711 | 12.03.1984 Original published format: US 588711 | US19840642336 | 20.08.1984 Original published format: US 642336 | [1985/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0158821 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158821 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/62, B64G9/00 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
B64G1/006 (EP);
B64G1/2427 (EP);
B64G1/409 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/43] | B64G1/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Raumfahrt | [1985/43] | English: | Apparatus and methods of extraterrestrial transportation | [1985/43] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le transport extra-terrestre | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 20.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.11.1987 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3421714 (KOERNER WARREN G); | [A]US4216058 (MARWICK EDWARD F [US]); | [AD]US4344913 (MARWICK EDWARD F); | [AP]US4436695 (MARWICK EDWARD F [US]) |