EP0194331 - Inspecting device for print [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, 1-chome, Taito Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
[N/P] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Toshiro 3-8-402, Izumi-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Fujita, Toshiji 5-20-7, Nobitome Niiza-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ishizuka, Kouichi 5-7-3, Minamikoshigaya Koshigaya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kinoshita, Yoshio 1043-53, Sojo Nutanischicho Mihara-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
[1986/38] | |||
Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
[N/P] | |||
Application number, filing date | 85102956.1 | 14.03.1985 | |
[1986/38] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | EP0194331 | ||
Date: | 17.09.1986 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[1986/38] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP0194331 | ||
Date: | 18.07.1990 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[1990/29] | |||
Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1985 |
Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00 | [1986/38] |
CPC: |
B41F33/0036 (EP,US);
H04N1/00037 (EP,US);
G01N21/956 (EP,US)
| ||
Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1986/38] | ||
Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Überprüfen von Abdrücken | [1986/38] |
English: | Inspecting device for print | [1986/38] | |
French: | Dispositif d'inspection d'impressions | [1986/38] | |
Examination procedure | 20.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/17] | |
24.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | ||
03.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
16.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | ||
25.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
13.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | ||
17.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
17.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | ||
17.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.1991
19.04.1991
ADMISSIBLE MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | |
02
17.04.1991
06.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch, et al, et al Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | |||
[N/P] | |||
23.05.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | ||
22.11.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | ||
03.12.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | ||
13.04.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | ||
25.01.1993 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | ||
29.11.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1996/08] | ||
Appeal following opposition | 17.02.1993 | Appeal received No. T0179/93 | |
24.05.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | ||
29.11.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | ||
29.11.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | ||
15.12.1995 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | ||
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
04.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
22.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2115145 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | |
[AD]GB2066949 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | |||
[A]GB2044925 (RCA CORP); | |||
[A]GB2119928 (POWERS MANUFACTURING) | |||
by applicant | US4488808 | ||
GB2044925 |