EP0163026 - Wagon for distributing and mixing silage and other animal fodder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Von der Heide, Hans Ibbenbürener Strasse 17 D-49479 Ibbenbüren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states von der Heide, Hans Ibbenbürener Strasse 17 D-49479 Ibbenbüren / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister Goldstrasse 36 48147 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Patentanwälte Schulze Horn und Hoffmeister Goldstrasse 36 D-48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103056.9 | 16.03.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | DE19843419874 | 28.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3419874 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163026 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163026 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01K5/00, A01D90/10, A01F25/20 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
A01K5/0266 (EP);
B01F35/71705 (EP,US);
A01D90/105 (EP);
A01F25/2027 (EP);
A01K5/005 (EP);
B01F25/90 (EP);
B01F33/26 (EP);
B01F33/5021 (EP);
B01F35/7178 (EP);
B01F35/7541 (EP,US);
A01F2025/2054 (EP);
B01F2101/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/49] | Title | German: | Verteilungs- und Mischwagen für Silage und anderes Viehfutter | [1985/49] | English: | Wagon for distributing and mixing silage and other animal fodder | [1985/49] | French: | Véhicule pour la distribution et le mélange de fourrage ensilé et d'autres aliments pour le bétail | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/11] | 16.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2364834 [ ] (LAPIERRE RAYMOND ARTHUR); | DE2621709 [ ] (MOERTL KARL); | DE2834782 [ ] (WESTBROCK WESTERIA MASCHF); | FR2449396 [ ] (WINDHOFF RHEINER MASCHF [DE]); | DE3033824 [ ] (HEIDE HANS VON DER [DE]); | SU1066512 [ ] (ZAJTSEV PETR V, et al) |