EP0195096 - Device for feeding or braking metal strips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1989 [1989/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umlauf, Norbert Haferkamp 64 58093 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | For all designated states Umlauf, Norbert Haferkamp 64 D-58093 Hagen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/39] | Representative(s) | Bergen, Klaus, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 11 01 23 40501 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/39] | Bergen, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. Reimar König, Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Bergen, Wilhelm-Tell-Strasse 14 D-40219 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103072.6 | 16.03.1985 | [1986/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0195096 | Date: | 24.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0195096 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65H20/06, B65H23/10, B21C47/00 | [1986/39] | CPC: |
B21C47/003 (EP,US);
B65H20/20 (KR);
B21C47/006 (EP,US);
B21C47/3458 (EP,US);
B65H20/06 (EP,US);
B65H20/16 (EP,US);
B65H23/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ziehen oder Bremsen von Metallbändern | [1986/39] | English: | Device for feeding or braking metal strips | [1986/39] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement ou de freinage de bandes métalliques | [1986/39] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 07.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2235350 (WEAN UNITED INC); | [Y]EP0088347 (UMLAUF NORBERT) |