EP0158164 - Substituted 4-hydroxy-benzopyrans, process for their preparation and their use in medicines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kabbe, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 16 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Widdig, Arno, Dr. Eifgenstrasse 8 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
Niewöhner, Ulrich, Dr. Gartenstrasse 3 D-5632 Wermelskirchen 3 / DE | 04 /
Knorr, Andreas, Dr. Pahlkestrasse 15 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 05 /
Garthoff, Bernward, Dr. Händelstrasse 22 D-4010 Hilden / DE | 06 /
Kazda, Stanislav, Dr. Heuselweg 18 D-5600 Wuppertal / DE | [1985/42] | Application number, filing date | 85103091.6 | 18.03.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | DE19843411992 | 31.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3411992 | [1985/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158164 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158164 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/96, C07D311/22, A61K31/35 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
C07D311/96 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D311/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | Substituierte 4-Hydroxy-benzopyrane, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung in Arzneimitteln | [1985/42] | English: | Substituted 4-hydroxy-benzopyrans, process for their preparation and their use in medicines | [1985/42] | French: | 4-Hydroxy-benzopyrannes substitués, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation dans des médicaments | [1985/42] | File destroyed: | 10.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 18.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 22.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2089348 (SANDOZ LTD) |