EP0155668 - Plasma sculpturing with a non-planar sacrificial layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION P.O. Box 37 Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [1985/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gimpelson, George E. 1080 North Highway A1A Apt. 801 Indialantic Florida 32903 / US | 02 /
Russo, Cheryl L. 1381 Certosa Avenue Palm Bay Florida / US | [1985/39] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, Dr.-Ing., et al Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte Hospitalstrasse 8 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103145.0 | 19.03.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | US19840591597 | 20.03.1984 Original published format: US 591597 | [1985/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155668 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155668 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/31 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
C03C15/00 (EP,US);
B23K10/00 (EP,US);
B23K28/00 (EP,US);
C03C23/006 (EP,US);
H01L21/31055 (EP,US);
H01L21/31116 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/39] | Title | German: | Plasmaätzverfahren unter Verwendung einer non-planaren Hilfsschicht | [1985/39] | English: | Plasma sculpturing with a non-planar sacrificial layer | [1985/39] | French: | Procédé d'attaque par plasma utilisant une couche auxiliaire non-planaire | [1985/39] | File destroyed: | 10.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/04] | 05.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.06.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2230148 (ITT [US]); | [A]DE2547792 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]GB2081159 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]EP0049400 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [E]EP0151948 (IBM [US]) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 3B, August 1982, pages 1402-1403, New YorkUS; E. KAMINSKY et al.: "Plasma planarization using differential etch-rate ratio" | [Y] - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS- THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, Spring Meeting, Washington, vol. 76-1, 2nd - 7th May 1976pages 119-121; W. KERN: "Chemical etching of dielectrics" | [X] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, vol. 24, no. 4, April 1981, pages 178-181, Port Washington, New YorkUS; A.C. ADAMS: "Plasma planarization" |