EP0159539 - Chip card system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albers, Hans-Erhard, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Eichenring 39 D-8551 Röttenbach / DE | 02 /
Linneweh, Eckard, Ing. grad. Otto-Hahn-Strasse,16 D-8056 Neufahrn / DE | 03 /
Müller, Dieter, Ing. grad. Mayrhofer Ring 32 D-8031 Seefeld 2 / DE | [1990/37] |
Former [1985/44] | 01 /
Albers, Hans-Erhard, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Eichenring 39 D-8551 Röttenbach / DE | ||
02 /
Linneweh, Eckard, Ing. grad. Ludwig-Braille-Strasse 4 D-8000 München 70 / DE | |||
03 /
Müller, Dieter, Ing. grad. Mayrhofer Ring 32 D-8031 Seefeld 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103258.1 | 20.03.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | DE19843412663 | 04.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3412663 | [1985/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159539 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159539 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/08, G07C9/00 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06K17/0022 (EP);
G06K19/07 (EP);
G06K19/0723 (EP);
G06K19/0728 (EP);
G06K19/073 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K7/1097 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/3576 (EP);
G06Q20/40145 (EP);
G07C9/257 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/44] | Title | German: | Chipkartensystem | [1985/44] | English: | Chip card system | [1985/44] | French: | Système de cartes à circuit intégré | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 26.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 05.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 11.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1991
11.07.1991
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.06.1991
11.07.1991
ADMISSIBLE GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Euckenstrasse 12 D-81369 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | 17.07.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.01.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 09.04.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.02.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.03.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1995/03] | CH | 12.09.1990 | |
LI | 12.09.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3806874 (EHRAT K); | [A]US4001550 (SCHATZ VERNON L); | [A]GB2020869 (DATAPLUS AG); | [A]GB2028555 (GEC TRAFFIC AUTOMATION); | [X]US4277837 (STUCKERT PAUL E); | [A]EP0032193 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0058029 (HALPERN JOHN WOLFGANG [GB], et al); | [A]EP0061373 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]); | [A]WO8203286 (LOEFBERG BO); | [A]WO8303694 (BENTON WILLIAM M) |