EP0155687 - Method of forming inspection patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillaume, Wallace Joseph 46 Cochran Hill Road Poughkeepsie, N.Y. 12603 / US | 02 /
Loughran, John Farley Blueberry Lane Stormville, N.Y. 12582 / US | 03 /
Rogoyski, Jan 17 Marlorville Road Wappingers Falls, N.Y. 12590 / US | 04 /
Weber, Edward Victor 60 Round Hill Road Poughkeepsie, N.Y. 12603 / US | 05 /
Simpson, Robert Arthur 30 Hilltop Drive Wappingers Falls, N.Y. 12590 / US | [1985/39] | Representative(s) | Tubiana, Max Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Tubiana, Max Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1988/41] | Combeau, Jacques Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1985/39] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103275.5 | 21.03.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | US19840592986 | 23.03.1984 Original published format: US 592986 | [1985/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155687 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155687 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155687 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/30, G03B41/00 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
G03F1/44 (EP,US);
G03F1/84 (EP,US);
H01J37/3005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/39] | Title | German: | Prüfmuster-Herstellungsmethode | [1985/39] | English: | Method of forming inspection patterns | [1985/39] | French: | Méthode d'obtention de motifs d'inspection | [1985/39] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 23.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0054710 (IBM [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 12, May 1980, page 5540, New York, US; W.D. GROBMAN: "Mask inspection using electron-beam systems" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF S.P.I.E, vol. 334, 31st April 1982, pages 230-237, Santa Clara, California, US; R.A. SIMPSON et al.: "Detecting submicron pattern defects on optical photomasks using an enhanced EL-3 electron-beam lithography tool" | Examination | - PROCEEDINGS OF S.P.I.E, vol. 334, March 31st - April 1st 1982, pages 230-237, Santa Clara, California, US; R.A. SIMPSON et al.: "Detecting submicron pattern defects on optical photomasks using an enhanced EL-3 electron-beam lithography tool" |