EP0163039 - Apparatus for texturing continuous filament yarns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nabulon, Werner Schneehalde 116 CH-8455 Rüdlingen / CH | [1985/49] | Application number, filing date | 85103477.7 | 25.03.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | CH19840002656 | 30.05.1984 Original published format: CH 265684 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163039 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163039 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D02G1/12 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
D02G1/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Texturieren von Endlosfilament-Fäden | [1985/49] | English: | Apparatus for texturing continuous filament yarns | [1985/49] | French: | Appareil pour la texturation de fils de filaments continus | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 15.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3343240 (PAOLO PARMEGGIANI, et al); | [A]DE2545590 (BAYER AG); | [A]US4188691 (HAYASHI KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al) |