EP0157329 - Rare earth-containing magnets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA 461 South Boylston Street Los Angeles, CA 90017 / US | [1985/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghandehari, Mohammad H. 1140 W. Walling Brea California 92621 / US | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103515.4 | 25.03.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | US19840595277 | 30.03.1984 Original published format: US 595277 | US19840595290 | 30.03.1984 Original published format: US 595290 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157329 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157329 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/08, H01F1/04 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
H01F1/0557 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/21] | H01F1/08, H01F1/08 | ||
Former IPC [1985/41] | H01F1/04, H01F1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | Seltene Erdmetalle enthaltende Magnete | [1985/41] | English: | Rare earth-containing magnets | [1985/41] | French: | Aimants contenant des terres rares | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 01.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/14] | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7300370 ; | [A]JP58108707 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, no. 2, 14th January 1974, page 365, abstract no. 8485j, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-73 00 370 (SUWA SEIKOSHA CO., LTD) 08.01.1973, & JP7300370 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7. no. 214 (E-199)[1359], 21st September 1983; & JP-A-58 108 707 (TOUHOKU KINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 28.06.1983, & JP58108707 A 00000000 | [AD] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 18, no. 4, 15th February 1971, pages 107-108, New York, US; J. TSUI et al.: "Sintering of PrCo5 permanent magnets" | [XP] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, vol. MAG-20, no. 5, part 2, September 1984, pages 1611-1613, IEEE, New York, US; M.H. GHANDEHARI et al.: "Magnetic hardening of PrCo5 by oxide additives" |