EP0158909 - Immobilized enzymes, processes for preparing same and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.1990 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REDCO N.V. Kuiermanstraat 1 2920 Kapelle op den Bos / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states REDCO N.V. Kuiermanstraat 1 B-2920 Kapelle op den Bos / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anton, Octavian Avenue des Croix du Feu, 241 B-1020 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
Crichton, Robert 7, Cortil du Bailly B-1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | 03 /
Lenders, Jean-Pierre 20, Avenue de la Corniche B-1310 La Hulpe / BE | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85103863.8 | 30.03.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | DE19843414232 | 14.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3414232 | DE19843436809 | 06.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3436809 | [1985/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158909 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158909 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158909 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/14, C12P19/14, C12P19/24 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
B01J23/40 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J23/462 (EP,US);
B01J23/755 (EP,US);
C01B33/187 (EP,US);
C07C209/36 (EP,US);
C07C4/06 (EP,US);
C07C5/10 (EP,US);
C07C5/417 (EP,US);
C12N11/14 (EP,US);
C12P19/14 (EP,US);
C12P19/24 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/617 (EP,US);
B01J35/638 (EP,US);
C01P2002/02 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/32 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
C07C2523/42 (EP,US);
C07C2523/44 (EP,US);
C07C2523/46 (EP,US);
C07C2523/755 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/10, C07C13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Immobilisierte Enzyme, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung | [1985/43] | English: | Immobilized enzymes, processes for preparing same and use thereof | [1985/43] | French: | Enzymes immobilisés, leur procédé de préparation et leur application | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 04.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2020527 (CORNING GLASS WORKS); | [X]FR2078427 (MONSANTO CO); | [X]EP0000028 (KALI CHEMIE AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0131251 (SUPERFOS AS [DK]) | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 13, no. 3, March 1981, pages 473-485, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., New York, US; D.W. SUNDSTROM et al.: "Enzymatic hydrolysis of cellulose to glucose using immobilized beta-glucosidase" | [XP] - STÄRKE, vol. 36, no. 12, December 1984, pages 412-416, Verlag Chemie GmbH, Weinheim, DE; G. WEIDENBACH et al.: "Glucose isomerase immobilized on SiO2-carrier with high productivity" |