EP0158925 - Printable film, process for preparing it and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSELTE METO INTERNATIONAL PRODUKTIONS GMBH Brentanostrasse 69434 Hirschhorn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states ESSELTE METO INTERNATIONAL PRODUKTIONS GMBH Brentanostrasse D-69434 Hirschhorn / DE | ||
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states Esselte Meto International GmbH Brentanostrasse Postfach 11 D-6932 Hirschhorn/Neckar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalus, Peter Im Spitzerfeld 70 D-6903 Neckargemünd / DE | 02 /
von Truchsess, Hanns-Martin Bohlenweg Nr. 16 D-8750 Aschaffenburg / DE | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/43] | Bunke, Holger, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Chem. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104014.7 | 03.04.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | DE19843413371 | 09.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3413371 | [1985/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0158925 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0158925 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158925 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C09D7/12 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
B44D3/18 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08K7/22 (EP,US);
C09D7/40 (EP,US);
C09J7/201 (EP,US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
G09F3/02 (EP,US);
C09J2203/334 (EP,US);
C09J2301/302 (EP,US);
C09J2301/414 (EP,US);
C09J2401/003 (EP,US);
C09J2423/046 (EP,US);
C09J2423/106 (EP,US);
C09J2425/003 (EP,US);
C09J2429/003 (EP,US);
C09J2431/003 (EP,US);
C09J2433/003 (EP,US);
C09J2461/003 (EP,US);
C09J2467/003 (EP,US);
C09J2475/003 (EP,US);
C09J2499/003 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0201 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0233 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0235 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0276 (EP,US);
G09F3/0294 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Bedruckbare Folie, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1985/43] | English: | Printable film, process for preparing it and use | [1985/43] | French: | Pellicule imprimable, procédé pour sa préparation et son application | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/32] | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1991
13.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Arjobex Ltd. Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road GB-London SW1W OSU / GB Opponent's representative Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | 02
26.04.1991
16.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Renker GmbH Kreuzauer Strasse 33 52355 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1991
13.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Arjobex Ltd. Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road GB-London SW1W OSU / GB Opponent's representative Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | ||
02
26.04.1991
16.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Renker GmbH Kreuzauer Strasse 33 52355 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
Former [1992/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1991
13.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Arjobex Ltd. Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road GB-London SW1W OSU / GB Opponent's representative Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | ||
02
26.04.1991
16.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE Opponent's representative Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | |||
Former [1991/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1991
Arjobex Ltd. Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road GB-London SW1W OSU / GB Opponent's representative Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | ||
02
26.04.1991
16.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE Renker GmbH & Co. KG Kreuzauerstrasse 33 Postfach 101746 D-52317 Düren / DE | |||
Former [1991/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1991
ADMISSIBLE Arjobex Ltd. Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road GB-London SW1W OSU / GB Opponent's representative Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | 11.06.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.10.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.02.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 12.05.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.07.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/46] | Appeal following opposition | 26.07.1993 | Appeal received No. T0685/93 | 30.09.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.07.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 30.07.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.08.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.04.1996 | CH | 30.04.1996 | LI | 30.04.1996 | [2003/01] |
Former [1997/16] | AT | 03.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB870330 (KALLE AG); | [Y]US3427184 (MAURO JEAN B, et al); | [X]GB1390137 (XEROX CORP); | [A]GB2117270 (BOWTHORPE HELLERMANN LTD) |