EP0157427 - Process for preparing glycosidic linkage related antigen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Masakazu 3493-9, Ishihara-machi Takasaki-shi Gunma / JP | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/41] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104143.4 | 04.04.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | JP19840068668 | 06.04.1984 Original published format: JP 6866884 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157427 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157427 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/02, A61K35/12 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
A61K39/001192 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/12 (KR);
Y10S530/828 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mit einer glycosidischen Verbindung verwandten Antigens | [1985/41] | English: | Process for preparing glycosidic linkage related antigen | [1985/41] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un antigène apparenté à la liaison glycosidique | [1985/41] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/06] | 28.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/33] | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0106285 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 9, 3rd March 1986, page 504, abstract no. 66770y, Columbus, Ohio, US; J. FISCHER et al.: "Lectin and immunochemical characterization of glycoproteins with regard to the alteration of the carbohydrate structure in gastric neoplasms", & ADV. CHEMOTHER. GASTROINTEST. CANCER, [INT. SYMP.] 1983 (Pub. 1984) 19-23 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 1, 3rd January 1983, page 314, abstract no. 3434d, Columbus, Ohio, US; S.I. HAKOMORI et al.: "The common structure in fucosyllactosaminolipids accumulating in human adenocarcinomas, and its possible absence in normal tissue", & BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN. 1982, 109(1), 36-44 |