EP0161472 - Device for controlling the relative angle between two parts of a semitrailer vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOTRASPORTI PADOVA ATP S.p.A. Via Trieste 42 35100 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states AUTOTRASPORTI PADOVA ATP S.p.A. Via Trieste 42 I-35100 Padova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terranova, Guido Via Monte Grande 32 I-35031 Abano Terme / IT | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85104179.8 | 05.04.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | IT19840041576 | 16.05.1984 Original published format: IT 4157684 | [1985/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161472 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161472 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62D53/08 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
B62D53/0871 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle des Relatifwinkels zwischen Schlepper und Aufliegeranhänger | [1985/47] | English: | Device for controlling the relative angle between two parts of a semitrailer vehicle | [1985/47] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de l'angle relatif entre un tracteur et une semi-remorque | [1985/47] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 30.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/04] | 28.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4106792 (SCHULTZ OTTO, et al); | [A]DE2806751 (WABCO FAHRZEUGBREMSEN GMBH); | [A]GB2069428 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [Y]EP0046484 (DIAMOIL S A [CH]); | [Y]US4344640 (RATSKO ISTVAN, et al); | [A]DE3127547 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]); | [Y]WO8400730 (FALKENRIED FAHRZEUG GMBH [DE]) |