EP0159643 - Process for the manufacture of alkoxylation products of organic carboxylic acids containing hydroxyl groups. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/44] | Process for the manufacture of alkoxylation products of organic carboxylic acids containing hydroxyl groups and their use in the manufacture of polyurethane synthetic resins | ||
[1989/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Probst, Joachim, Dr. Humperdinckstrasse 42 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Sonntag, Michael, Dr. Gartenstrasse 27a D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
Richter, Roland, Dr. Roggendorfstrasse 53 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 04 /
Müller, Hans Peter, Dr. Im Kerberich 6 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | [1985/44] | Application number, filing date | 85104528.6 | 15.04.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | DE19843415531 | 26.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3415531 | [1985/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159643 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159643 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159643 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08G18/62 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
C08G65/2645 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/6258 (EP,US);
C08G65/105 (EP,US);
C08G65/2615 (EP,US);
C08G65/2669 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxylgruppen aufweisenden Alkoxylierungsprodukten von organischen Carbonsäuren. | [1989/28] | English: | Process for the manufacture of alkoxylation products of organic carboxylic acids containing hydroxyl groups. | [1989/28] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de produits d'alkoxylation d'acides carboxyliques organiques renfermant des groupes hydroxyles. | [1989/28] |
Former [1985/44] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxylgruppen aufweisenden Alkoxylierungsprodukten von organischen Carbonsäuren und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Polyurethankunststoffen | ||
Former [1985/44] | Process for the manufacture of alkoxylation products of organic carboxylic acids containing hydroxyl groups and their use in the manufacture of polyurethane synthetic resins | ||
Former [1985/44] | Procédé de fabrication de produits d'alkoxylation d'acides carboxyliques organiques renfermant des groupes hydroxyles et leur application pour la fabrication de résines synthétiques de polyuréthanes | Examination procedure | 15.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/44] | 07.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB771569 (DISTILLERS CO YEAST LTD); | [X]FR1259128 (CANADIAN IND); | [X]BE648451 ; | [AD]GB1002343 (CANADIAN IND); | [X]EP0040789 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |