EP0162283 - Process for the electrochemical roughening of aluminium printing plate supports in an aqueous mixed electrolyte [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.1989 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohr, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Mainstrasse 5 D-6229 Schlangenbad 5 / DE | 02 /
Frass, Werner, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Erbsenacker 37 D-6200 Wiesbaden-Naurod / DE | [1985/48] | Application number, filing date | 85104605.2 | 16.04.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | DE19843415364 | 25.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3415364 | [1985/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0162283 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0162283 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162283 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25F3/04, B41N1/08 | [1985/48] | CPC: |
B41N3/034 (EP,US);
C25F3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/22] |
Former [1985/48] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Verfahren zur elektrochemischen Aufrauhung von Aluminium für Druckplattenträger in einem wässrigen Mischelektrolyten | [1985/48] | English: | Process for the electrochemical roughening of aluminium printing plate supports in an aqueous mixed electrolyte | [1985/48] | French: | Procédé de grainage électrochimique d'aluminium pour supports de plaques d'impression dans un électrolyte composite aqueux | [1985/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 19.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55011364 ; | [A]JP56087313 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 93, Nr. 4, 28. Juli 1980, Seite 618, Nr. 35852b, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-55 011 364 (MITSUBISHI, KEIKINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 26.01.1980, & JP55011364 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 95, Nr. 16, 19. Oktober 1981, Seite 714, Nr. 143008f, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-56 087 313 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) 15.07.1981, & JP56087313 A 00000000 |