EP0159035 - Use of reactive diluents for epoxy resins, and epoxy balk compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PCI Polychemie GmbH Piccardstrasse 10 D-8900 Augsburg 1 / DE | [1985/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Psader, Josef J.S.Bach-Strasse 12 D-8902 Neusäss / DE | 02 /
Huber, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Donauwärther Strasse 36 D-8901 Königsbrunn / DE | 03 /
Kucera, Wolfgang Finkenweg 36 D-8900 Augsburg 1 / DE | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104685.4 | 18.04.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | DE19843414769 | 18.04.1984 Original published format: DE 3414769 | [1985/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159035 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159035 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/42, C04B26/14, C08L63/00, C08G59/14 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
C04B26/14 (EP);
C04B41/4853 (EP);
C08G59/1438 (EP);
C08G59/1461 (EP);
C08G59/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/43] | C08G59/42, C04B26/14, C08L63/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1985/43] | Title | German: | Verwendung von reaktiven Verdünnern für Epoxidharze, sowie Epoxidharzmasse | [1985/43] | English: | Use of reactive diluents for epoxy resins, and epoxy balk compounds | [1985/43] | French: | Utilisation de diluants réactifs pour résines époxydes, ainsi que masses de résines époxydes | [1985/43] | File destroyed: | 10.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE970975 ; | [A]FR1135967 ; | [A]DE2142307 ; | [A]EP0083813 | [L] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 102, Nr. 22, 3. Juni 1985, Seite 50, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassungsnr. 186190q, Columbus, Ohio, US; I. DOBAS et al.: "Blends of epoxy resins with dibutyl maleate as binders for plastic concretes and molded floor coverings" &Plasty Kanc. 1984, Band 21, Nr. 12366-369 (Kat. P,X) |