EP0174430 - Device for automatically completing a game coupon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hospi Data GmbH & Co. Herwigstrasse 36 D-2850 Bremerhaven / DE | [1989/38] |
Former [1986/12] | For all designated states Spitzkowsky, Manfred W.-Delius-Strasse 21 D-2850 Bremerhaven / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spitzkowsky, Manfred W.-Delius-Strasse 21 D-2850 Bremerhaven / DE | 02 /
Stehr, Thomas Südendstrasse 15 D-1000 Berlin 41 / DE | 03 /
Holzhüter, Detlev Herwigstrasse D-2850 Bremerhaven / DE | [1986/12] | Representative(s) | Ninnemann, Detlef Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Xantener Strasse 10 D-10707 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1988/35] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Xantener Strasse 10 D-10707 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1987/42] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing. CHRISTIANSEN & NINNEMANN Dietrich-Schäfer-Weg 21 D-1000 Berlin 41 / DE | ||
Former [1987/37] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing. CHRISTIANSEN & NINNEMANN Dietrich-Schäfer-Weg 21 D-1000 Berlin 41 / DE | ||
Former [1986/12] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104767.0 | 19.04.1985 | [1986/12] | Priority number, date | DE19843433542 | 13.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3433542 | [1986/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174430 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174430 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174430 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/42, G07F17/00, G06K7/00, G07C15/00 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
G07F17/0014 (EP);
A63F3/0645 (EP);
G07F17/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/24] | G07F17/42, G06K1/12, G06K7/00, G07C15/00 | ||
Former IPC [1986/12] | G06K17/00, G06K1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum automatischen Ausfüllen eines Spielscheines | [1986/12] | English: | Device for automatically completing a game coupon | [1986/12] | French: | Dispositif pour remplir de matière automatique un formulaire de jeu | [1986/12] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 19.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.05.1988 | 01.05.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2652487 (REBBE KLAUS ING GRAD); | [A]EP0010399 (CUBIC WESTERN DATA [US]); | [A]DE3243777 (HEISE BODO [DE]) |