EP0159677 - Novel 4,5-bis(4-methoxyphenyl)-2-(pyrrol-2-yl)thiazoles, process for the preparation thereof and pharmaceutical composition containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshino, Koichiro No. 3-D11-201, Furue-dai 5-chome Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Seko, Norihiko Takakura Green Mansion 305 No. 12-21, Tomobuchi-cho 2-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Yokota, Koichi No. 203, Mozu Nishino-cho 2-chome Sakai-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Ito, Keizo No. 6-2-405, Tomobuchi-cho 1-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Tsukamoto, Goro No. 2-8, Toneyama 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/44] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85104786.0 | 19.04.1985 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | JP19840079924 | 19.04.1984 Original published format: JP 7992484 | JP19840156184 | 25.07.1984 Original published format: JP 15618484 | JP19850040802 | 28.02.1985 Original published format: JP 4080285 | [1985/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159677 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159677 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159677 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, A61K31/425 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D207/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/44] | Title | German: | 4,5-Bis-(4-Methoxyphenyl)-2-(pyrrol-2-yl)-thiazole, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen die sie enthalten | [1985/44] | English: | Novel 4,5-bis(4-methoxyphenyl)-2-(pyrrol-2-yl)thiazoles, process for the preparation thereof and pharmaceutical composition containing the same | [1985/44] | French: | 4,5-Bis-(4-méthoxyphényl)-2-(pyrrol-2-yl) thiazoles, procédé pour les préparer et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 18.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0077024 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [YD]US4168315 (RYNBRANDT RONALD H, et al); | [YD]EP0037274 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) | [YD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 24, no. 12, December 1981, pages 1507-1510, American Chemical Society, Washington, D.C., US; R.H. RYNBRANDT et al.: "Synthesis and platelet aggregation inhibitory activity of 4,5-bis(aryl)-2-substituted-thiazoles" |