EP0163112 - Method and device for the centrifugal separation of fine-grained mineral mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miset AG Sonnhaldenstrasse 89 CH-6331 Hünenberg / CH | [1985/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sedlaczek, Walter 41/93 Elizabeth Bay Road Elizabeth Bay, N.S.W. 2011 / AU | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Scheidegger, Werner & Co. Siewerdtstrasse 95 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Scheidegger, Werner & Co. Siewerdtstrasse 95 CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 85104851.2 | 22.04.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | CH19840002129 | 02.05.1984 Original published format: CH 212984 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163112 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163112 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163112 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/02 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
B04B5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Trennschleudern von Feinkornmineralgemischen | [1985/49] | English: | Method and device for the centrifugal separation of fine-grained mineral mixtures | [1985/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la séparation centrifuge de mélanges de minéraux à grains fins | [1985/49] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 11.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.10.1989 | FR | 04.10.1989 | GB | 04.10.1989 | IT | 04.10.1989 | NL | 04.10.1989 | SE | 04.10.1989 | [2007/44] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 04.10.1989 | |
FR | 04.10.1989 | ||
GB | 04.10.1989 | ||
IT | 04.10.1989 | ||
NL | 04.10.1989 | ||
SE | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 04.10.1989 | |
GB | 04.10.1989 | ||
IT | 04.10.1989 | ||
NL | 04.10.1989 | ||
SE | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1991/13] | BE | 04.10.1989 | |
GB | 04.10.1989 | ||
NL | 04.10.1989 | ||
SE | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 04.10.1989 | |
NL | 04.10.1989 | ||
SE | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/27] | NL | 04.10.1989 | |
SE | 04.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/21] | SE | 04.10.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1084095 (BASF AG); | [AD]DE1133321 (BETEILIGUNGS & PATENTVERW GMBH); | [A]DE1153688 (THAELMANN SCHWERMASCHBAU VEB); | [A]US4052518 (BORISOV VASILY NIKOLAEVICH, et al) |