EP0159048 - Automatic wrapping mechanism for rotobalers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meiers, Gerald Franklyn 1014 Chester Ottumwa Iowa 52501 / US | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Fricke, Joachim, et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/43] | Fricke, Joachim, Dr., et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105228.2 | 14.09.1982 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | US19810303274 | 17.09.1981 Original published format: US 303274 | [1985/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0159048 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0159048 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159048 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/14 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
A01F15/141 (EP,US);
A01F2015/076 (EP,US);
A01F2015/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1985/43] | Title | German: | Automatische Bindeeinrichtung für Maschinen zum Herstellen von zylindrischen Ballen aus Erntegut in einer Wickelkammer | [1985/43] | English: | Automatic wrapping mechanism for rotobalers | [1985/43] | French: | Dispositif de liage automatique pour balles cylindriques dans une chambre d'enroulage | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 14.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82108465.4 / EP0075252 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4150614 (SCHWARTZ DALE R [US]) |