EP0160318 - Printing system for dot-matrix printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimoyama, Norio Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshimura, Kohtaroh Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Matsumura, Takeshi Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hatakeyama, Motonobu Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/45] | Representative(s) | Betten, Jürgen, et al Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Betten, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/48] | Betten, Jürgen Dipl.-Ing. Betten & Gleiss Patentanwälte Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-8000 München 5 / DE | ||
Former [1985/45] | Betten, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Lieck & Betten Maximiliansplatz 10 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105384.3 | 02.05.1985 | [1985/45] | Priority number, date | JP19840087803 | 02.05.1984 Original published format: JP 8780384 | [1985/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0160318 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0160318 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0160318 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/10, B41J2/22 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
B41J2/5058 (EP);
G06K15/10 (EP);
G06K2215/0074 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/03] | G06K15/10, B41J3/12 | ||
Former IPC [1985/45] | G06K15/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/45] | Title | German: | Drucksystem für einen Punktmatrixdrucker | [1985/45] | English: | Printing system for dot-matrix printer | [1985/45] | French: | Système à imprimer pour une imprimante en matrice de points | [1985/45] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 07.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3125426 ; | [A]US4431319 |