EP0163949 - Support, particularly for mounting a combustion engine in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | For all designated states AUDI AG D-85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states AUDI AG Postfach 2 20 D-8070 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollerweger, Heinz Effnerstrasse 20 D-8070 Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
van den Boom, Johannes Marie-Luise-Fleisser-Strasse 16 D-8073 Kösching / DE | 03 /
Kuipers, Geert Am Kirchenweg 1a D-8070 Ingolstadt / DE | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | le Vrang, Klaus AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Le Vrang, Klaus AUDI AG, Patentabteilung D-85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [1985/50] | Le Vrang, Klaus AUDI AG, Abteilung I/EXA D-85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105392.6 | 03.05.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | DE19843421137 | 07.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3421137 | [1985/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163949 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163949 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163949 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00, B60K5/12, F16F7/10 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
F16F13/22 (EP,US);
F16F13/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Lager, insbesondere zur Lagerung einer Brennkraftmaschine in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [1985/50] | English: | Support, particularly for mounting a combustion engine in a motor vehicle | [1985/50] | French: | Support, en particulier pour le montage d'un moteur à combustion dans un véhicule à moteur | [1985/50] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/50] | 15.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4415148 [ ] (MAIR CHRISTIAN [DE], et al); | DE3125040 [ ] (CMM CHRISTIAN MARIA MAIR ENTWI [DE]); | EP0039823 [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) | Examination | DE2947018 | EP0110197 |