EP0197181 - Composite plate method of manufacturing injection molding manifold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gellert, Jobst Ulrich 7A Prince Street Georgetown Ontario L7G 2X1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states Gellert, Jobst Ulrich 7A Prince Street Georgetown Ontario L7G 2X1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105512.9 | 06.05.1985 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | CA19850478674 | 09.04.1985 Original published format: CA 478674 | [1986/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0197181 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0197181 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0197181 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/00, B29C45/27 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
B23K1/008 (EP,US);
B23K37/06 (EP,US);
B23P15/007 (EP,US);
B29C45/2725 (EP,US);
B29C45/2737 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Verbundplattenverfahren zur Herstellung eines Spritzgiessverteilblockes | [1986/42] | English: | Composite plate method of manufacturing injection molding manifold | [1986/42] | French: | Méthode à plaques composites pour la fabrication d'un bloc d'injection à coulée sous pression | [1986/42] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 16.08.1989 | [1990/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3095604 (ACKARET ROBERT L); | [A]GB956097 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]FR2238569 (HEHL KARL [DE]); | [A]GB1503921 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]GB2010722 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [Y]FR2497938 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [YD]EP0083760 (GELLERT JOBST U); | [A]FR2548066 (CETEC AG [CH]) | [A] - KUNSTSTOFFE, vol. 74, no. 12, December 1984, pages 710-713, Munich, DE; H.-M. WOLFF: "Fortschritte beim Bau von Heisskanalsystemen" |