EP0162370 - Voltage comparator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1988 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/48] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demler, Michael John 742 Huntington Drive Schenectady New York / US | [1985/48] | Representative(s) | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald GE/RCA Patent Operation Burdett House, 4th Floor 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | [1987/47] |
Former [1985/48] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 85105583.0 | 07.05.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | US19840613480 | 24.05.1984 Original published format: US 613480 | [1985/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0162370 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0162370 | Date: | 17.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/356, G11C7/06 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
G01R19/0038 (EP,US);
G11C7/065 (EP,US);
H03K3/35606 (EP,US);
H03K3/356095 (EP,US);
H03K3/356156 (EP,US);
H03K5/249 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/48] | H03K3/356 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/48] | Title | German: | Spannungskomparator | [1985/48] | English: | Voltage comparator | [1985/48] | French: | Comparateur de tension | [1985/48] | File destroyed: | 10.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 08.10.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57127335 ; | [Y]US3993917 (KALTER HOWARD LEO); | [Y]WO8203513 (NCR CO [US]); | [A]GB1451784 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK); | [A]US3838404 (HEEREN R) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 222 (E-140)[1100], 6th November 1982; & JP-A-57 127 335 (SHARP K.K.) 07-08-1982, & JP57127335 A 00000000 |