EP0163187 - Vehicle roof luggage carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adam Opel Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofsplatz 1 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states Adam Opel Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofsplatz 1 D-65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallion, Georg A. Joh.-Sebastian-Bach-Strasse 35 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Bratke, Dieter N. Lärchenweg 14 D-6081 Wallerstädten / DE | 03 /
Helbig, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) P.-Hessemer-Strasse 86 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | 04 /
Reuter, Karl F. Ing. grad. Komotauer Weg 6 D-6092 Kelsterbach / DE | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Rosenfeld, Jürgen, et al Adam Opel Ag Patentabteilung Bahnhofsplatz 1 Postfach 17 10 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Rosenfeld, Jürgen, Dipl. Ing., et al Adam Opel Ag Patentabteilung Bahnhofsplatz 1 Postfach 17 10 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/14] | Spitzl, Karl c/o Adam Opel AG Patentabteilung Bahnhofsplatz 1 Postfach 1710 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | ||
Former [1985/49] | Elbert, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Adam Opel AG Patentabteilung Bahnhofsplatz 1 Postfach 1560 D-6090 Rüsselsheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105827.1 | 11.05.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | DE19843418770 | 19.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3418770 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163187 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163187 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163187 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/04 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
B60R9/058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/49] | Title | German: | Dachgepäckträger für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1985/49] | English: | Vehicle roof luggage carrier | [1985/49] | French: | Porte-bagages sur le toit d'un véhicule | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 16.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2939671 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]); | [A]DE2945950 (LANGBAUER JOSEF); | [A]DE3151405 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]); | [A]DE3151404 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]); | [A]DE3209912 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) |