EP0163992 - Sealed and locked socket joint for plastic pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1986 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1986 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.1986 [1986/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEILER, Georg Pachmayrplatz 11 D-8000 München 81 / DE | [1985/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Fricke, Joachim, et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Fricke, Joachim, Dr., et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105908.9 | 14.05.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | DE19843418585 | 18.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3418585 | [1985/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163992 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/50] | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/08 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
F16L37/092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Abgedichtete und gegen Schubkräfte gesicherte Muffenverbindung an Kunststoffrohren | [1985/50] | English: | Sealed and locked socket joint for plastic pipes | [1985/50] | French: | Raccord à manchon étanche et verrouillé pour tuyaux en matière plastique | [1985/50] | File destroyed: | 21.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |