EP0169326 - Method and apparatus for producing a macroscopic surface pattern with a microscopic structure, in particular an optical-diffraction structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/05] | Method for producing a macroscopic surface pattern with a microscopic structure, in particular an optical-diffraction structure | ||
[1989/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LGZ LANDIS & GYR ZUG AG CH-6301 Zug / CH | [1986/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antes, Gregor Moussonstrasse 14 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | [1986/05] | Application number, filing date | 85106087.1 | 17.05.1985 | [1986/05] | Priority number, date | CH19840003277 | 06.07.1984 Original published format: CH 327784 | [1986/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169326 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169326 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06K1/12, B29C59/02 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
G03H1/028 (EP,US);
B29C59/02 (EP,US);
G06K1/126 (EP,US);
G06K19/16 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0838 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B29L2011/00 (EP,US);
B29L2017/003 (EP,US);
G03H1/0236 (EP,US);
G03H1/0244 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0497 (EP,US);
G03H2224/06 (EP,US);
G03H2260/61 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines makroskopischen Flächenmusters mit einer mikroskopischen Struktur, insbesondere einer beugungsoptisch wirksamen Struktur | [1989/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing a macroscopic surface pattern with a microscopic structure, in particular an optical-diffraction structure | [1989/10] | French: | Procédé et un dispositif de fabrication d'un motif de surface macroscopique à structure microscopique, en particulier d'une structure de diffraction optique | [1989/10] |
Former [1986/05] | Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines makroskopischen Flächenmusters mit einer mikroskopischen Struktur, insbesondere einer beugungsoptisch wirksamen Struktur | ||
Former [1986/05] | Method for producing a macroscopic surface pattern with a microscopic structure, in particular an optical-diffraction structure | ||
Former [1986/05] | Procédé de fabrication d'un motif de surface macroscopique à structure microscopique, en particulier d'une structure de diffraction optique | Examination procedure | 14.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 02.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1729040 ; | [A]GB1026317 (IBM); | [Y]US4064205 (LANDSMAN ROBERT M); | [Y]FR2401484 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 10, Nr. 6, November 1967, Seite 760, New York, US; F. HOLMSTROM u.a.: "Deformation recording method" |