EP0162435 - Article formed from a thin sheet of material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/48] | Article forming system | ||
[1993/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Highland Supply Corporation 1111 Sixth Street Highland, Illinois 62249 / US | [1985/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weder, Donald E. 621 Main Street Highland Illinois / US | 02 /
Craig, Franklin J. 90 Inez Avenue Valley Park Missouri / US | 03 /
Weder, Erwin H. 1034 Washington Highland Illinois / US | 04 /
Dunn, R.E. Jack 2014 North Air Lane St. Louis Missouri / US | 05 /
Weder, Herbert A. P.O.box P.O. Box 241 Highland, Illinois / US | [1986/33] |
Former [1986/31] | 01 /
Weder, Donald E. 621 Main Street Highland Illinois / US | ||
02 /
Craig, Franklin J. 90 Inez Avenue Valley Park Missouri / US | |||
03 /
Weder, Erwin H. 1034 Washington Highland Illinois / US | |||
04 /
Dunn, R.E. Jack 2014 North Air Lane St. Louis Missouri / US | |||
05 /
Weder, Herbert A. P.O. Box 241 | |||
Former [1985/48] | 01 /
Weder, Donald E. 621 Main Street Highland Illinois / US | ||
02 /
Craig, Franklin J. 90 Inez Avenue Valley Park Missouri / US | |||
03 /
Weder, Erwin H. 1034 Washington Highland Illinois / US | |||
04 /
Dunn, R.E. Jack 2014 North Air Lane St. Louis Missouri / US | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85106169.7 | 20.05.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | US19840613080 | 22.05.1984 Original published format: US 613080 | [1985/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0162435 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0162435 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162435 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/00, B29C53/04, // B29L22/00 | [1985/48] | CPC: |
A47G7/085 (EP,US);
A01G5/04 (EP,US);
A01G5/06 (EP,US);
A01M1/02 (EP,US);
A47F5/16 (EP,US);
A47F7/0078 (EP,US);
B29C51/08 (EP,US);
B29C51/262 (EP,US);
B29C61/02 (EP,US);
B29C61/0608 (EP,US);
B31F1/0045 (EP,US);
B31F1/0077 (EP,US);
B44C1/1733 (EP,US);
B44C3/04 (EP,US);
B44C3/087 (EP,US);
B44C5/00 (EP,US);
B44C5/06 (EP,US);
B44F1/10 (EP,US);
B65B25/02 (EP,US);
B65B25/023 (EP,US);
B65B25/026 (EP,US);
B65B47/06 (EP,US);
B65B61/025 (EP,US);
B65B67/08 (EP,US);
B65D33/20 (EP,US);
B65D33/22 (EP,US);
B65D5/50 (EP,US);
B65D63/109 (EP,US);
B65D65/14 (EP,US);
B65D65/22 (EP,US);
B65D71/0085 (EP,US);
B65D75/14 (EP,US);
B65D75/54 (EP,US);
B65D75/5827 (EP,US);
B65D81/267 (EP,US);
B65D81/28 (EP,US);
B65D81/36 (EP,US);
B65D85/505 (EP,US);
B65D85/52 (EP,US);
G09F23/00 (EP,US);
G09F23/105 (EP,US);
G09F3/04 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
B29C51/082 (EP,US);
B31B2100/00 (EP,US);
B31B2110/10 (EP,US);
B31B2110/20 (EP,US);
B31B2120/70 (EP,US);
B31B50/00 (EP,US);
B31B50/44 (EP,US);
B31B50/442 (EP,US);
B31B50/59 (EP,US);
B31B50/81 (EP,US);
B65D2565/388 (EP,US);
B65D85/36 (EP,US);
Y10S220/912 (EP,US);
Y10S229/93 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1036 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1051 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1341 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1359 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/216 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24008 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/48] | Title | German: | Gegenstand aus dünnem blattförmigen Material | [1993/16] | English: | Article formed from a thin sheet of material | [1993/16] | French: | Objet formé à partir d'une feuille mince | [1993/16] |
Former [1985/48] | System zum Formen eines Gegenstandes | ||
Former [1985/48] | Article forming system | ||
Former [1985/48] | Système pour former un objet | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/16: Teilanmeldung 92117304.3 eingereicht am 20/05/85 | EPB 1993/16: Divisional application 92117304.3 filed on 20/05/85 | EPB 1993/16: Demande divisionnaire 92117304.3 déposée le 20/05/85 | Examination procedure | 21.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 06.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 31.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92117304.3 / EP0532059 | EP92117322.5 / EP0530851 | EP96112817.0 / EP0743171 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Request for further processing for: | 10.01.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR433587 (PUBLIC SERVICE CUP C [US]); | [A]US1799357 (DAVIS HARRY G); | [A]US2019117 (EUGENE CONTI); | [A]US2268937 (HARVEY LEO M); | [X]US2355559 (FRANK RENNER); | [A]FR69158E ; | [A]US2968064 (HOWELL GEORGE H); | [A]BE643235 ; | [A]US3349153 (RUDOLF BECK); | [A]FR2137816 (RISSEN GMBH MASCHF); | [A]FR2202774 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]CH560532 (BERGER EDOUARD); | [A]DE2630021 (WAGNER MASCHF HEINRICH); | [A]FR2373380 (MANGIERI DOMINIQUE [FR]); | [A]US4216620 (WEDER DONALD E [US], et al); | [A]US4300312 (WEDER EDWIN H, et al); | [X]US4381278 (INGRAFFEA DOMINIC D) |