EP0169992 - N,N'- and N,N',N'-substituted silylureas and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deschler, Ulrich, Dr. Birkenweg 1 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 02 /
Buder, Wolfgang, Dr. Loteamento Farol de Itapoan Rua F Nr. 7 Salvador Bahia / BR | 03 /
Kleinschmit, Peter, Dr. Wildaustrasse 19 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 04 /
Michel, Rudolf Josefstrasse 36 D-6463 Freigericht / DE | [1986/06] | Application number, filing date | 85106181.2 | 21.05.1985 | [1986/06] | Priority number, date | DE19843424534 | 04.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3424534 | [1986/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169992 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C07F7/10 | [1986/06] | CPC: |
C07F7/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/06] | Title | German: | -N,N'- und N,N',N'-substituierte Silylharnstoffe und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1986/06] | English: | N,N'- and N,N',N'-substituted silylureas and process for their preparation | [1986/06] | French: | Silylurées substituées en position N,N' et N,N',N' et procédé de leur préparation | [1986/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.05.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5657792 ; | [A]GB990161 (MERCK & CO INC); | [AD]US3493461 (STERMAN SAMUEL, et al); | [A]US3726907 (TESORO G, et al); | [XD]US4046794 (PEPE ENRICO J, et al); | [XD]NL8006415 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 5, Nr. 120 (C-65), 4. August 1981, Seite 83 C 65; & JP - A - 56 57792 (SHINETSU KAGAKU) 20.05.1981 (Cat. D); & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 95, Nr. 23, 7. Dezember 1981, Seite 701, Spalte 1, Abstract Nr. 204144w, Columbus, Ohio, US; SHIN ETSU CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. "Alkoxysilanes containing ureide groups", & JP5657792 A 00000000 |