EP0162451 - Labial sanitary pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | ||
Former [1985/48] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401, North Lake Street Neenah Wisconsin 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lassen, Frederich O. 749 Oak Street Neenah Wisconsin 54956 / US | 02 /
Peerenboom, Robert J. 521 West Cleveland Avenue Little Chute Wisconsin / US | 03 /
Schultz, Cheri L. 521 East McKinley Appleton Wisconsin / US | [1985/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85106238.0 | 21.05.1985 | [1985/48] | Priority number, date | US19840612506 | 21.05.1984 Original published format: US 612506 | US19840654927 | 27.09.1984 Original published format: US 654927 | US19850707338 | 01.03.1985 Original published format: US 707338 | [1985/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0162451 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162451 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
A61F13/47227 (EP);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/47245 (EP);
A61F13/47272 (EP);
A61F13/53717 (EP);
A61F13/5514 (EP);
A61F13/47209 (EP);
A61F13/534 (EP);
A61F13/53409 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1985/48] | A61F13/16, A61F13/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/48] | Title | German: | Der Form der Schamlippen sich anpassende hygienische Vorlage | [1985/48] | English: | Labial sanitary pad | [1985/48] | French: | Garniture hygiénique s'adaptant à la forme des lèvres de la vulve | [1985/48] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 21.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.08.1991 | CH | 07.08.1991 | LI | 07.08.1991 | [1992/15] |
Former [1992/09] | CH | 07.08.1991 | |
LI | 07.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | US2662527 [ ] (GRANT JACKS WILLIARD); | GB754481 [ ] (EDUARD NEUMANN); | US4079739 [ ] (WHITEHEAD HOWARD A); | FR2420339 [ ] (BEGHIN SAY SA [FR]); | US4397644 [ ] (MATTHEWS BILLIE J, et al); | US4433972 [ ] (MALFITANO AMANDA [US]) | Examination | EP0161663 |