EP0163250 - Process for the preparation of dry alkali metal salts of 1,8-naphthalimide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spietschka, Ernst, Dr. Kirchweg 3 D-6270 Idstein/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Urban, Manfred Steigerwaldstrasse 2a D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1985/49] | Application number, filing date | 85106280.2 | 22.05.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | DE19843420161 | 30.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3420161 | [1985/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0163250 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0163250 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163250 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/14 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
C07D221/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung der trockenen Alkalimetallsalze des 1,8-Naphthalsäureimids | [1985/49] | English: | Process for the preparation of dry alkali metal salts of 1,8-naphthalimide | [1985/49] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de sels secs de métaux alcalins de 1,8-naphtalimide | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3997572 (CUSIC JOHN W, et al); | [AD]DE2137242 ; | [AD]US4051246 (WADE PETER C, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS | Examination | EP0123256 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 54, Nr. 13, 10. Juli 1960, Columbus, Ohio, USA, Spalte 13 073g,h; A.P. KARISHIN et. al.: "N-alkyl derivatives of naphthalimide and halonaphtalimides" |