EP0166209 - Device for checking protective measures in electrical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziegler, Herbert Hartensteiner Strasse 66 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Hochreuther, Karl Hersbrucker Strasse 98 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
Kindermann Robert Brettergartenstrasse 9 8550 Nürnberg 90 / DE | [1992/16] |
Former [1986/01] | 01 /
Ziegler, Herbert Hartensteiner Strasse 66 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02 /
Hochreuther, Karl Hersbrucker Strasse 98 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/14] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | ||
Former [1986/01] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85106334.7 | 23.05.1985 | [1986/01] | Priority number, date | DE19843421880 | 13.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3421880 | [1986/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0166209 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0166209 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166209 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/145, G01R15/08 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
G01R19/145 (EP);
G01R15/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1986/01] | Title | German: | Messgerät zur Überprüfung der Schutzmassnahmen in elektrischen Anlagen | [1986/01] | English: | Device for checking protective measures in electrical equipment | [1986/01] | French: | Appareil de contrôle des mesures de protection dans des installations électriques | [1986/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/35] | 24.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2633786 (METRAWATT GMBH); | [A]US4314312 (DONMOYER WILLIAM L, et al); | [A]DE3130786 (PHYWE AG [DE]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 19, Nr. 8, Januar 1977, Seiten 2830-2831, New York, US; C.P. LUDEMAN et al.: "Universal probe point" | Examination | - "de/der elektromeister + deutsches elektrohandwerk", Heft 3/78, Seiten 148 bis 152 |