EP0164625 - Ski boot incorporating a foot securing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states NORDICA S.p.A Via Montebelluna 5/7 I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sartor, Mariano Via Barile 8 I-31044 Montebelluna (Treviso) / IT | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85106345.3 | 23.05.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | IT19840021967U | 30.05.1984 Original published format: IT 2196784 U | [1985/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0164625 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164625 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [1985/51] | CPC: |
A43B5/0449 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1985/51] | Title | German: | Skischuh mit eingebauter Vorrichtung zur Befestigung des Fusses | [1985/51] | English: | Ski boot incorporating a foot securing device | [1985/51] | French: | Chaussure de ski à dispositif incorporé de fixation du pied | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 20.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0099504 (NORDICA SPA [IT]); | [AP]DE3342121 (SALOMON & FILS F [FR]) |