EP0164641 - Manufacturing method of injection-moulded objects of polycarbonate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritsch, Karl-Herbert, Dr. Hackberg 25 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | 02 /
Bier, Peter, Dr. Bodelschwinghstrasse 18 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1985/51] | Application number, filing date | 85106553.2 | 29.05.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | DE19843421647 | 09.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3421647 | [1985/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164641 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164641 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164641 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/06, B29C45/00 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
B29B9/12 (EP,US);
B29B9/06 (EP,US);
B29C2045/0091 (EP,US);
B29C45/00 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/51] | B29B9/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polycarbonat-Spritzgussformkörpern | [1985/51] | English: | Manufacturing method of injection-moulded objects of polycarbonate | [1985/51] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'objets moulés par moulage par injection en polycarbonate | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 03.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3007204 (ULRICH VEIEL, et al); | [Y]DE714708 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG); | [AD]DE1190167 (BAYER AG); | [AD]DE1137167 (BAYER AG) |