EP0164058 - Free-flowing pearl lustre dispersions with a low share of surface-active agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1992 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1992 [1992/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quack, Jochen Meinhard, Dr. Wilhelm-Reuter-Strasse 16 D-6239 Eppstein/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Reng, Alwin Im Schulzehnten 22 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 03 /
Skrypzak, Werner Eichkopfallee 33 D-6237 Liederbach / DE | 04 /
Kunz, Walter Karl-Staib-Strasse 21 D-6234 Hattersheim am Main / DE | [1985/50] | Application number, filing date | 85106562.3 | 29.05.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | DE19843421161 | 07.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3421161 | [1985/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164058 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164058 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164058 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D1/52, C11D1/72, A61K7/075, A61K7/50 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
C11D17/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
C11D1/523 (EP,US);
C11D1/86 (EP,US);
C11D3/0089 (EP,US);
A61K2800/596 (EP,US);
C11D1/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1985/50] | C11D1/52, C11D1/72 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/50] | Title | German: | Fliessfähige Perlglanzdispersion mit niedrigem Tensidanteil | [1985/50] | English: | Free-flowing pearl lustre dispersions with a low share of surface-active agents | [1985/50] | French: | Dispersions à aspect perlé à bon écoulement ayant une part basse d'agents tensio-actifs | [1985/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 15.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56071021 ; | [A]DE3317909 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]DE1669152 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE2016439 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, Sektion C, Band 5, Nr. 136, 28. August 1981 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 108 C 69 & JP-A-56071021 (LION K.K.), & JP56071021 A 00000000 |