EP0163321 - X-ray tube apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1989 [1989/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Katsuhiro c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Sakuma, Tatsuya c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Hiroshi c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85106754.6 | 31.05.1985 | [1985/49] | Priority number, date | JP19840111905 | 31.05.1984 Original published format: JP 11190584 | [1985/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0163321 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0163321 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/06 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
H01J35/30 (EP,US);
H01J35/066 (EP,US);
H01J35/064 (EP,US);
H01J35/147 (EP,US);
H01J35/153 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/49] | Title | German: | Röntgenröhre | [1985/49] | English: | X-ray tube apparatus | [1985/49] | French: | Tube à rayons X | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 20.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP5713658 [ ]; | DE2447570 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | US4065690 [ ] (MAEYAMA SHIGEO); | US4126805 [ ] (RANDALL ROBERT P); | GB1597693 [ ] (EMI LTD); | DE3136184 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, E section, vol. 6, no. 72, May 7, 1982 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 126 E 105 & JP-A-57-13 658 (hitachi seisakusho), & JP5713658 A 00000000 | Examination | US4344011 |