EP0164100 - Polymeric pyridinium ylide and products from same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taylor, Lloyd D. One Maureen Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 02 /
Haubs, Michael Karl-Josef Auf dem Weiher 18 D-6550 Bad Kreuznach 1 / DE | [1985/50] | Representative(s) | Reitzner, Bruno, et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85106888.2 | 05.06.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | US19840617726 | 06.06.1984 Original published format: US 617726 | [1985/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164100 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164100 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164100 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038, C08F246/00 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
C08F246/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/00 (KR);
C08F20/36 (KR);
C08F20/60 (KR);
G03F7/038 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/50] | G03F7/10, C08F246/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Ylide-pyridinium-Polymeren und daraus hergestellte Materialien | [1985/50] | English: | Polymeric pyridinium ylide and products from same | [1985/50] | French: | Polymères pyridinium ylides et produits préparés à partir de ceux-ci | [1985/50] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 79, no. 6, 13th August 1973, page 370, abstract no. 37032u, Columbus, Ohio, US; A. GILBERT: "Organic aspects of photochemistry. Photoreactions of compounds containing heteroatoms other than oxygen", & PHOTOCHEMISTRY 1971, 2, 630-96 | [AD] - CHEMICAL REVIEWS, vol. 73, no. 3, May/June 1973, pages 255-281, American Chemical Society, Easton, PA., US; W. J. KILLIP et al.: "The chemistry of aminimides" | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 35, no. 2, February 1970, pages 433-438, American Chemical Society, Easton, PA., US; A. BALASUBRAMANIAN et al.: "The photoisomerization of 1-Iminopyridinium Ylides to 1(1H),2-Diazepines" | [A] - BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, no.6, 1969, pages 2175-2180, Société Française de Chimie, Paris, Fr; J. STREITH et al.: "No. 382 - Synthèse photochimique de (1-H)-Diazépines-1,2 III," | Examination | DE2456893 | US3985793 |