EP0164705 - Process for manufacturing phthalaldehydacetals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1988 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Degner, Dieter, Dr. Kurpfalzstrasse 8 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | [1985/51] | Application number, filing date | 85107063.1 | 07.06.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | DE19843421976 | 14.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3421976 | [1985/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164705 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164705 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164705 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C25B3/02 | [1985/51] | CPC: |
C25B3/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Phthalaldehydacetalen | [1985/51] | English: | Process for manufacturing phthalaldehydacetals | [1985/51] | French: | Procédé de production de phtalaldéhydacétals | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 09.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0054698 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0012240 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3108790 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) |