EP0172332 - Fiber for reinforcing plastic composites and reinforced plastic composites therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solares Cordova, David c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | 02 /
Coffin, David Richard c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | 03 /
Lazarus, Stanley David c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | 04 /
Young, Steven Anthony c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | ||
Former [1989/10] | Brock, Peter William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | ||
Former [1987/34] | Brock, Peter William UOP Processes International Corporation 48 Leicester Square London WC2H 7LW / GB | ||
Former [1986/09] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107090.4 | 08.06.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | US19840631978 | 18.07.1984 Original published format: US 631978 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172332 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172332 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172332 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/507, C08J5/06 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
D06M15/507 (EP,US);
C08J5/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2969 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/09] | Title | German: | Faser für Verstärkung von Harzverbundmaterialien und die so hergestellten verstärkten Harzverbundmaterialien | [1986/09] | English: | Fiber for reinforcing plastic composites and reinforced plastic composites therefrom | [1986/09] | French: | Fibre pour renforcer les composites à base de matière plastique et composites renforcés ainsi obtenus | [1986/09] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3639424 (GRAY THEODORE F JR, et al); | [X]US4268645 (LARK JOHN C); | [A]US4400425 (VANHA VLADIMIR [US]) |