EP0164737 - A method of fabricating self-aligned regions in a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION P.O. Box 37 Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [1985/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gasner, John T. 634 Ford Circle West Melbourne Florida 32935 / US | 02 /
Hause, Frederick N. 3769 Jupiter Boulevard, S.E. Palm Bay Florida 32905 / US | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Dauster, Hanjörg Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Dauster, Hanjörg, Dipl.-Ing. WILHELM & DAUSTER Patentanwälte Hospitalstrasse 8 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1985/51] | Dauster, Hanjörg, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte Hospitalstrasse 8 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107216.5 | 12.06.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | US19840620835 | 15.06.1984 Original published format: US 620835 | US19840643362 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: US 643362 | [1985/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164737 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164737 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0164737 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/31, H01L21/82, H01L21/28, H01L29/08 | [1985/51] | CPC: |
H01L21/033 (EP);
H01L21/823892 (EP);
H01L27/0928 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen selbstjustierter Bereiche in einem Substrat | [1985/51] | English: | A method of fabricating self-aligned regions in a substrate | [1985/51] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de régions auto-alignées dans un substrat | [1985/51] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 10.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0074215 ; | [A]US4435896 (PARRILLO LOUIS C [US], et al); | [A]EP0054259 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 6, page 2730, November 1982, New York, US; J. GRESCHNER et al.: "Process for image reversal" |