EP0172344 - Power saving system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1989 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION 4400 Computer Drive Westboro Massachusetts 01580 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | For all designated states DATA GENERAL CORPORATION 4400 Computer Drive Westboro Massachusetts 01580 / US | ||
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states Nippon Data General Corporation 6-12-20, Jingumae Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katayama, Hideji 8-4, Ichiriyama-cho Gyoda-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Iijima, Etsuo 1350-1, Ooazaokabe Okabe-machi Oosato-gun Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakazawa, Masao 1-4-37, Nagano Gyoda-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Ide, Tomoyuki 12-27, Asahi-cho Gyoda-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Eitle, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107333.8 | 13.06.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | JP19840173434 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17343484 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172344 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172344 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G06F1/3215 (EP);
G06F1/325 (EP);
G06F1/3278 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/09] | Title | German: | Leistungsaufnahmeersparungssystem | [1986/09] | English: | Power saving system | [1986/09] | French: | Système pour économiser la consommation de puissance | [1986/09] | File destroyed: | 02.04.1997 | Examination procedure | 13.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/09] | 24.10.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3956740 (JONES MICHAEL DALE, et al); | [A]JPS599729 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 97 (P-272)[1534]8th May 1984; & JP-A-59 009 729 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 19-01-1984 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 18, no. 4, September 1975pages 1005-1006; J.W. GILLILAND et al.: "Power supply controls" |