EP0204860 - Methods and arrangements for characterizing magnetic coating compositions as well as improving magnetic particle dispersions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunsch, Arwed, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Am Bopserweg 8 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 02 /
Steiner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Zeisigweg 17/1 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | 03 /
Trippel, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Steinenbronner Strasse 15 D-7032 Sindelfingen / DE | [1989/04] |
Former [1986/51] | 01 /
Brunsch, Arwed, Dr. Dipl.-Phys Am Bopserweg 8 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | ||
02 /
Steiner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Zeisigweg 17/1 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | |||
03 /
Trippel, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Steinenbronner Strasse 15 D-7032 Sindelfingen / DE | Representative(s) | Herzog, Friedrich Joachim Birkenstrasse 77 71155 Altdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | Herzog, Friedrich Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Birkenstrasse 77 D-71155 Altdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107346.0 | 13.06.1985 | [1986/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204860 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204860 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/74 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
G01N27/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnungen zur Bestimmung der Eigenschaften magnetischer Beschichtungzusammensetzungen sowie zur Verbesserung magnetischer Partikeldispersionen | [1986/51] | English: | Methods and arrangements for characterizing magnetic coating compositions as well as improving magnetic particle dispersions | [1986/51] | French: | Méthodes et appareils pour caractériser des compositions magnétiques de recouvrement ainsi que pour améliorer les dispersions de particules magnétiques | [1986/51] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 31.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0103655 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al); | [A]US3271664 (MOUNTZ JOHN M, et al); | [A]EP0023456 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) |