EP0166339 - A light radiator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mori, Kei 3-16-3-501, Kaminoge Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states Mori, Kei 3-16-3-501, Kaminoge Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/01] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107434.4 | 14.06.1985 | [1986/01] | Priority number, date | JP19840124299U | 15.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12429984 U | [1986/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0166339 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166339 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F21P3/00, A01G7/00 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
F21S10/005 (EP,US);
F21V7/04 (KR);
F21S10/002 (EP,US);
F21S11/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/0096 (EP,US);
Y10S362/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/01] | Title | German: | Lichtstrahler | [1986/01] | English: | A light radiator | [1986/01] | French: | Dispositif rayonnant la lumière | [1986/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 23.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR47621E (CIE PARISIENNE DE DISTRIB D EL); | [A]AT331552B (RUTHNER OTHMAR [AT]) |