EP0169367 - Reversible optical information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/05] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Noboru 4-2, Kuzuhaoka-1-chome Hirakata-shi / JP | 02 /
Ohno, Eiji 22-7, Korinishiocho Nayagawa-shi / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Kunio 5-1-612, Makinokitamachi Hirakata-shi / JP | [1986/05] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/05] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107452.6 | 14.06.1985 | [1986/05] | Priority number, date | JP19840123001 | 15.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12300184 | JP19840123002 | 15.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12300284 | JP19840123003 | 15.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12300384 | JP19840123004 | 15.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12300484 | JP19840127970 | 21.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12797084 | [1986/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169367 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169367 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24308 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24316 (EP,US);
G11B2007/2432 (EP,US);
G11B7/2533 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31699 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/05] | Title | German: | Auswechselbares optisches Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium | [1986/05] | English: | Reversible optical information recording medium | [1986/05] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement optique de l'information réversible | [1986/05] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/35] | 26.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [APD]EP0121426 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |