EP0168661 - Aminopyrazolinones, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | [1986/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Batz, Hans-Georg, Dr. Traubinger Strasse 63 D-8132 Tutzing / DE | 02 /
Herrmann, Rupert, Dr. Heinrichstrasse 3 D-8120 Weilheim / DE | 03 /
Siedel, Joachim, Dr. Bahnhofstrasse 6 D-8131 Bernried / DE | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107564.8 | 19.06.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | DE19843422732 | 19.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3422732 | [1986/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0168661 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0168661 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/46, G01N31/22, // C12Q1/28 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
C12Q1/28 (EP,US);
C07D231/46 (EP,US);
C12Q2326/96 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/04] | Title | German: | Neue Aminopyrazolinone, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1986/04] | English: | Aminopyrazolinones, their preparation and use | [1986/04] | French: | Aminopyrazolinones, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1986/04] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/04] | 30.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE92009 [ ]; | DE3100807 [ ] (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | US4321397 [ ] (NIX PAUL T, et al) |