EP0166365 - Integral multilayer analytical element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiratsuka, Nobuo c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 3-11-46, Senzui Asaka-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Asaji c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 3-11-46, Senzui Asaka-shi Saitama / JP | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107571.3 | 19.06.1985 | [1986/01] | Priority number, date | JP19840126267 | 19.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12626784 | [1986/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0166365 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0166365 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166365 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52, G01N31/22 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/525 (EP,US);
Y10S435/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/01] | Title | German: | Integraler Mehrfachteststreifen | [1986/01] | English: | Integral multilayer analytical element | [1986/01] | French: | Elément analytique intégral à multicouches | [1986/01] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/11] | 13.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 27.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4046513 (JOHNSON LEIGHTON CLIFFORD); | [Y]EP0066648 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]FR2355290 (ALFA LAVAL AB [SE]); | [X]GB2065302 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]US4256693 (KONDO ASAJI, et al); | [A]DE3222366 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2191734 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) |