EP0170842 - N-benzylcyclopropanecarboxamide derivatives, process for their preparation and fungicides for agriculture and horticulture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/07] | N-benzylcyclopropanecarboxamide derivatives, process and intermediates for their preparation and fungicides for agriculture and horticulture | ||
[1989/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO K.K. No.4, 2-chome, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO K.K. No.4, 2-chome, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurahashi, Yoshio 47-15, Oya-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shiokawa, Kozo 210-6, Shukugawara Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kagabu, Shinzo 432-131-105, Terada-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sakawa, Shinji 1-14-13, Tamadaira Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Moriya, Koichi 39-15, Namiki-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1986/07] | Representative(s) | Ernst, Hilmar, et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | Ernst, Hilmar, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107613.3 | 20.06.1985 | [1986/07] | Priority number, date | JP19840135268 | 02.07.1984 Original published format: JP 13526884 | JP19840138955 | 06.07.1984 Original published format: JP 13895584 | [1986/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0170842 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170842 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/737, A01N53/00, C07C61/15 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
A01N53/00 (EP);
C07C233/59 (KR);
C07C61/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/07] | Title | German: | N-Benzylcyclopropancarboxamid-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Fungizide für Landwirtschaft und Gartenbau | [1989/37] | English: | N-benzylcyclopropanecarboxamide derivatives, process for their preparation and fungicides for agriculture and horticulture | [1989/37] | French: | Dérivés de N-benzylcyclopropanecarboxamide, procédé pour leur preperation et fongicides pour l'agriculture et l'horticulture | [1989/37] |
Former [1986/07] | N-Benzylcyclopropancarboxamid-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, Zwischenprodukte für diese, und Fungizide für Landwirtschaft und Gartenbau | ||
Former [1986/07] | N-benzylcyclopropanecarboxamide derivatives, process and intermediates for their preparation and fungicides for agriculture and horticulture | ||
Former [1986/07] | Dérivés de N-benzylcyclopropanecarboxamide, procédé et intermédiaires pour leur préparation et fongicides pour l'agriculture et l'horticulture | Examination procedure | 20.06.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 26.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP5826847 ; | [A]JP5829751 ; | [A]US3856976 (WAGNER W, et al); | [A]US3277107 (NEIGHBORS RALPH P) | [AD] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 100 (C-164)[1245], 28. April 1983; & JP - A - 58 26847 (SUMITOMO KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 17.02.1983, & JP5826847 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 108 (C-165)[1253], 11. Mai 1983; & JP - A - 58 29751 (SUMITOMO KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 22.02.1983, & JP5829751 A 00000000 |