EP0169383 - Image reader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/05] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagano, Fumikazu 46-13, Izumihara-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken / GB | [1986/05] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1986/05] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 85107705.7 | 21.06.1985 | [1986/05] | Priority number, date | JP19840129888 | 22.06.1984 Original published format: JP 12988884 | JP19840175352 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: JP 17535284 | [1986/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0169383 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0169383 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169383 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/46 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
H04N1/484 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/05] | Title | German: | Bildlesevorrichtung | [1986/05] | English: | Image reader | [1986/05] | French: | Dispositif de lecture d'images | [1986/05] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 22.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57150270 ; | [A]JP55030214 | [Y] - XEROX DISLOSURE JOURNAL, vol. 6, no. 4, July/August 1981, page 203, Rochester, US; R.H. TUHRO: "Color copy with single monochrome CCD" | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 251 (E-147)[1129], 10th December 1982; & JP-A-57 150 270 (FUJI XEROX K.K.) 17-09-1982, & JP57150270 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 59 (E-9)[541], 2nd May 1980; & JP-A-55 030 214 (RICOH K.K.) 04-03-1980, & JP55030214 A 00000000 |